NC S166 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Summary
Disapprove Jordan Lake Rules.
Title
Disapprove Jordan Lake Rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-16 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-02-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H239 (Same As) 2011-03-08 - Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S166 |