NC S145 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DOT/DMV Legislative Requests
Title
DOT/DMV Legislative Requests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A1 Stevens Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A2 Potts Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Amend 2 M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A1 Stevens Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A2 Potts Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Amend 2 M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-74 | |
2018-06-25 | Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Ratified | |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub and H Amend |
2018-06-15 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A2 |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Recon A2 |
2018-06-15 | House | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-06-15 | House | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A2 |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-15 | House | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Filed |