NC S144 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Summary
Limit Liability/Domestic Violence Shelters.
Title
Limit Liability/Domestic Violence Shelters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Placed On Cal For 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-03-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S144 |