NC S1421 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ch. SL 2010-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ch. SL 2010-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forest City/Convey Property
Title
Forest City/Convey Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Ch. SL 2010-54 | |
2010-07-06 | Ratified | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-14 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-26 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1420 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government