NC S1362 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Orange/Alamance Boundary
Title
Orange/Alamance Boundary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-61 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-24 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-16 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-02 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1933 (Same As) 2010-05-24 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance