NC S1300 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Ch. Res 2010-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Ch. Res 2010-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Arthur W. Williamson
Title
Honor Arthur W. Williamson
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Ch. Res 2010-9 | |
2010-06-17 | Ratified | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2010 | |
2010-06-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |