NC S1298 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Various Local Occupancy Taxes
Title
Various Local Occupancy Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Daniel Blue [D] | Sen. Tony Foriest [D] | Sen. Steve Goss [D] |
Sen. John Snow [D] | Sen. Donald Vaughan [D] | Sen. Michael Walters [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. SL 2010-78 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1894 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance