NC S1286 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Screen For BMI Children CCNC Network
Title
Screen For BMI Children CCNC Network
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1904 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House