NC S120 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV
Pending: House Judiciary IV Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV
Pending: House Judiciary IV Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DOI License Processing Fees
Title
DOI License Processing Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV |
2015-07-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H196 (Same As) 2015-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate