NC S114 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-11 - Ch. SL 2009-79
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-11 - Ch. SL 2009-79
Summary
Exempt Churches & Clubs LU/LA Elevators.
Title
Exempt Churches & Clubs LU/LA Elevators.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hoyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-11 | Ch. SL 2009-79 | |
2009-06-11 | Signed By Gov. 6/11/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Pres. To Gov. 6/3/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Ratified | |
2009-06-01 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-05-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/1/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-21 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-04 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-05-04 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-30 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed On Cal For 4/30/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-11 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S114 |