NC S113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Ch. SL 2020-49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Ch. SL 2020-49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Education Omnibus
Title
Education Omnibus
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Kirk deViere [D] | Sen. Natasha Marcus [D] | Sen. Mujtaba Mohammed [D] |
Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Ch. SL 2020-49 | |
2020-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2020 | |
2020-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020 | |
2020-06-26 | Ratified | |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2020-06-25 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2020-06-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-06-25 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2020-06-25 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2020-06-24 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2020-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020 |
2020-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/12/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |