NC S106 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Home Birth Freedom Act
Title
Home Birth Freedom Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H154 (Same As) 2013-02-27 - Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Finance