NC S105 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Penalties/Murder and DWI Deaths
Title
Increase Penalties/Murder and DWI Deaths
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-165 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-27 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-26 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-26 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-05-04 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-05-04 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-05-03 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2011-05-02 | Placed On Cal For 5/3/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-28 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-03-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-23 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-02-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |