NC S101 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Require Cooperation with ICE 2.0

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require Cooperation with ICE 2.0

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-16HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-03-16SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed
2021-03-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-11SenateAmend Adopted A2
2021-03-11SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-03-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-09SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-09SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-03-09SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-17SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-15SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
162(n/a)See Bill Text
16262(n/a)See Bill Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S101
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S101v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S101v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S101v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S101v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1088/0/S101-PCS35100-TT-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1273/0/S101-A-NBC-8772
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1274/0/S101-A-NBC-8773
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S101-SMTT-2(e1)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S101-SMTT-6(CSTT-3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S101-SMTT-7(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S101-SMTT-7(e2)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S101-SMTT-10(e3)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/44
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/43
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/42

Bill Comments

feedback