NC H991 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Ch. SL 2018-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Fox Trapping Local Omnibus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fox Trapping Local Omnibus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-15 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseCh. SL 2018-10
2018-06-15HouseRatified
2018-06-15HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-15SenateConf Report Adopted
2018-06-15HouseConf Report Adopted
2018-06-15SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-15SenateConf Com Reported
2018-06-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-15HouseConf Com Reported
2018-06-14SenateConf Com Appointed
2018-06-13HouseConf Com Appointed
2018-06-13HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Cal For 06/13/2018
2018-06-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-12HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-01SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2018-05-31SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-05-31SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-31SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-05-31HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-05-31HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-05-31HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-05-30HousePlaced On Cal For 05/31/2018
2018-05-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-05-30HouseReptd Fav
2018-05-24HouseRe-ref Com On State and Local Government I
2018-05-24HouseWithdrawn From Com
2018-05-24HouseRef To Com On State and Local Government II
2018-05-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-22HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H991&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H991v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H991v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H991v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H991v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H991v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1075
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=718
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1218

Bill Comments

feedback