NC H972 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law Enforcement Recordings/No Public Record
Title
Law Enforcement Recordings/No Public Record
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 88 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - A7 Richardson, W. Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-06-27 - House - A6 Queen Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-06-27 - House - A5 Fisher Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - A4 Reives Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - A2 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-06-23 - House - A1 Reives Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - A7 Richardson, W. Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-06-27 - House - A6 Queen Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-06-27 - House - A5 Fisher Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - A4 Reives Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - A2 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-06-23 - House - A1 Reives Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Ch. SL 2016-88 | |
2016-07-11 | Signed by Gov. 7/11/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-29 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2016-06-27 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-27 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-27 | House | Amend Failed A7 |
2016-06-27 | House | Amend Failed A6 |
2016-06-27 | House | Amend Failed A5 |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2016-06-23 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A3 |
2016-06-23 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2016-06-23 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2016 |
2016-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Filed |