NC H954 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Terminate Agreement for Tolling of I-77
Title
Terminate Agreement for Tolling of I-77
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/02/2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-01 | House | Reptd Com Sub w/o Prejud |
2016-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2016-06-01 | House | Reptd Com Sub w/o Prejud |
2016-04-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Appropriations |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | House | Filed |