NC H944 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Summary
Disclosure by Appointees.
Title
Disclosure by Appointees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-23 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H944 |