NC H880 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
NC Semiquincentennial Legislative Commission
Title
NC Semiquincentennial Legislative Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] | Rep. Diane Wheatley [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] |
Rep. Zack Forde-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Commissions
Cultural Resources
General Assembly
Joint
Membership
President Pro Tempore
Reports
Resolutions
Semiquincentennial Comn.
Speaker
Commissions
Cultural Resources
General Assembly
Joint
Membership
President Pro Tempore
Reports
Resolutions
Semiquincentennial Comn.
Speaker
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 3.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |