NC H88 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Clay County's 150th Anniversary
Title
Honor Clay County's 150th Anniversary
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Carney [D] | Rep. David Guice [R] | Rep. Kelly Hastings [R] | Rep. Ray Rapp [D] |
Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] | Rep. Roger West [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - R2 For Adopt (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Placed On Cal For 2/17/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-02-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-15 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-02-15 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S59 (Same As) 2011-02-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate