NC H866 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
pPROM Awareness
Title
pPROM Awareness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Postponed To 05/06/2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/01/2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Filed |