NC H85 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Ch. SL 2020-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Ch. SL 2020-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Emissions/Lee, Onslow, & Rockingham Counties
Title
Emissions/Lee, Onslow, & Rockingham Counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Ch. SL 2020-5 | |
2020-06-05 | Signed by Gov. 6/5/2020 | |
2020-05-29 | Pres. To Gov. 5/29/2020 | |
2020-05-28 | Ratified | |
2020-05-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-05-27 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2020-05-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/27/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2020-05-22 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-03-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/20/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-03-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-03-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-14 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |