NC H833 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Driver Education Oversight/Lane Departure
Title
Driver Education Oversight/Lane Departure
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Johnson [R] | Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Julia Howard [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] |
Rep. John Fraley [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Education - K-12 Stricken |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Education - K-12 |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |