NC H819 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Coastal Management Policies
Title
Coastal Management Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 68 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 83 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 83 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Ratified | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-20 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-19 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-19 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-19 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-13 | Ref To Com On Environment | |
2012-06-13 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-13 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-11 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-02 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-05-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-29 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Environment | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |