NC H813 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit State Agencies Payment of Ransomware
Title
Prohibit State Agencies Payment of Ransomware
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Colleges & Universities
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Crimes
Cybersecurity
Education
Education Boards
Electronic Government
Emergency Services
Higher Education
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Internet
Local Government
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Stem
Unc
Unc Boards Of Trustees
Unc System Office
Colleges & Universities
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Crimes
Cybersecurity
Education
Education Boards
Electronic Government
Emergency Services
Higher Education
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Internet
Local Government
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Stem
Unc
Unc Boards Of Trustees
Unc System Office
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 800 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 1320 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 1322 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 1379 | (n/a) | Citation Text |