NC H813 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Ch. SL 2012-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Ch. SL 2012-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Building Code Inspections/Industrial Machinery
Title
Building Code Inspections/Industrial Machinery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Ch. SL 2012-34 | |
2012-06-20 | Signed By Gov. 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Ratified | |
2012-06-13 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-12 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-12 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-06 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-06 | Ref To Com On Program Evaluation | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/2/2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-13 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S532 (Same As) 2011-07-26 - Ch. SL 2011-401