NC H808 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - Ch. SL 2023-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Gender Transition/Minors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gender Transition/Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-16 - House - Veto Override (Y: 74 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 67 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - A1 Jackson, N. Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-16 Ch. SL 2023-111
2023-08-16SenateVeto Overridden
2023-08-16SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2023-08-16HouseVeto Overridden
2023-08-07HousePlaced On Cal For 08/16/2023
2023-08-07HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2023-08-03HousePlaced On Cal For 08/15/2023
2023-08-03HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2023-07-20HousePlaced On Cal For 08/07/2023
2023-07-20HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2023-07-17HousePlaced On Cal For 07/20/2023
2023-07-17HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2023-07-12HousePlaced On Cal For 07/19/2023
2023-07-12HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2023-07-06HousePlaced On Cal For 07/12/2023
2023-07-05HouseReceived from the Governor
2023-07-05 Vetoed 07/05/2023
2023-06-30 Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2023
2023-06-29 Ratified
2023-06-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2023-06-28HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2023-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2023-06-28HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2023-06-28HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2023-06-28SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2023-06-27SenateEngrossed
2023-06-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2023-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2023-06-27SenateAmend Failed A4
2023-06-27SenateAmend Adopted A5
2023-06-27SenateAmend Tabled A3
2023-06-27SenateAmend Tabled A2
2023-06-27SenateAmend Tabled A1
2023-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2023-06-22SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-06-22SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2023-06-22SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-06-21SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2023-06-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2023-06-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-06-14SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2023-05-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-05-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-05-04SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2023-05-03HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2023-05-03HouseOrdered Engrossed
2023-05-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2023-05-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2023-05-03HouseAmend Adopted A1
2023-05-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2023-05-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2023-05-03HouseReptd Fav
2023-05-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-05-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-05-01HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary 1 Stricken
2023-05-01HouseSerial Referral To Families, Children, and Aging Policy Stricken
2023-04-19HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-04-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2023-04-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S639 (Same As) 2023-04-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2023/H808
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H808v8.pdf
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H808-SMBC-63(CSBC-16)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H808-SMBC-66(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H808-SMBC-93(ABC-29)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H808-SMBC-95(e4)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H808-SMBC-96(e5)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H808-SMBC-100(e6)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/341
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/340
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/360
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/359
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/358
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/357
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/356
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/479
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/434
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/509

Bill Comments

feedback