NC H808 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Advisory Council Review of Rare Disease Bills

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advisory Council Review of Rare Disease Bills

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-26SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-04-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S310 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback