NC H807 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modify Firearms Retrieval Process in DV Cases
Title
Modify Firearms Retrieval Process in DV Cases
Sponsors
Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] | Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] |
Rep. Charles Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2023-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Records
Domestic Violence
Evidence
Family Issues
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Minors
Public
Records
Sheriffs
Weapons
Witnesses
Women
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Records
Domestic Violence
Evidence
Family Issues
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Minors
Public
Records
Sheriffs
Weapons
Witnesses
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
132 | 1.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
50B | 3.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |