NC H800 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Various Changes to Charter School Laws
Title
Various Changes to Charter School Laws
Sponsors
Rep. John Bradford [R] | Rep. Jason Saine [R] | Rep. Scott Stone [R] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] |
Rep. Debra Conrad [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 85 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - A2 Richardson, B. Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - A1 Ager Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - A2 Richardson, B. Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - A1 Ager Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-173 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2017-04-25 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-24 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2017-04-24 | House | Serial Referral To State and Local Government II Stricken |
2017-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, State and Local Government II |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |