NC H80 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ban Electronic Sweepstakes
Title
Ban Electronic Sweepstakes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-103 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-23 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-23 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-21 | Engrossed | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-17 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/6/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-09 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S38 (Same As) 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-414