NC H77 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - If Favorable Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - If Favorable Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Apply for TBI Medicaid Waiver
Title
Apply for TBI Medicaid Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | If Favorable Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S335 (Same As) 2011-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget