NC H766 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Ch. SL 2015-154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amend CBD Oil Statute

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend CBD Oil Statute

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-16 Ch. SL 2015-154
2015-07-16 Signed by Gov. 7/16/2015
2015-07-16 Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2015
2015-07-15 Ratified
2015-07-14HouseOrdered Enrolled
2015-07-14HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2015-07-13HousePlaced On Cal For 07/14/2015
2015-07-13HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2015-07-02HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2015-07-02SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2015-07-01 Engrossed
2015-07-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2015-07-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A5
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A4
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A3
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A2
2015-07-01SenateAmend Adopted A1
2015-06-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2015
2015-06-24SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2015-06-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2015
2015-06-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2015-06-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2015
2015-06-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2015-06-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-06-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-05-05SenateRe-ref Com On Health Care
2015-05-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-04-23SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-04-23SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-04-23SenateRegular Message Received From House
2015-04-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2015-04-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-04-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-04-22HouseAdded to Calendar
2015-04-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-04-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-04-15HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-04-14HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=H766&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H766v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H766v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H766v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H766v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H766v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H766v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H766v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=327
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=480
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=481
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=484
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=485
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=486
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=487
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=834

Bill Comments

feedback