NC H752 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amend Controlled Substances Act
Title
Amend Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] | Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] |
Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] | Rep. Howard Penny [R] | Rep. Ray Pickett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 87 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 89 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 91 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 92 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 93 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 95 | (n/a) | Citation Text |