NC H743 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Remove ID Mark/Increase Punishment
Title
Remove ID Mark/Increase Punishment
Sponsors
Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Rep. Charles Miller [R] | Rep. Jake Johnson [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] |
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Ch. SL 2021-36 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Gov. 6/16/2021 | |
2021-06-11 | Pres. To Gov. 6/11/2021 | |
2021-06-10 | Ratified | |
2021-06-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-09 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-06-09 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-06-08 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agricultural Equipment
Agriculture
Chaptered
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Fraud
Id Systems
Presented
Public
Ratified
Sentencing
Theft
Agriculture
Chaptered
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Fraud
Id Systems
Presented
Public
Ratified
Sentencing
Theft
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 160.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 401.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text |