NC H694 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
First Responders/Health Care POAs Required
Title
First Responders/Health Care POAs Required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Ambulances
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Employment
Firefighters & Firefighting
Health Care Directives
Health Services
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Personnel
Power Of Attorney
Public
Rescue Squads
Title Change
Volunteers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Employment
Firefighters & Firefighting
Health Care Directives
Health Services
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Personnel
Power Of Attorney
Public
Rescue Squads
Title Change
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
95 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
95 | 28.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text |