NC H693 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transporter Plates/Repossessions
Title
Transporter Plates/Repossessions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |