NC H680 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-17 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Start-Ups Act/New Markets Tax Credit Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Start-Ups Act/New Markets Tax Credit Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-20 - House of Representatives - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-17SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2014-07-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2014-07-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-06-24SenateRef to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance
2013-06-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-06-24SenateRec From House
2013-06-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-06-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/20/2013
2013-06-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-06-19HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2013-05-09HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2013-05-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-04-11HouseRef To Com On Commerce and Job Development
2013-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback