NC H660 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Funeral Procession Law
Title
Amend Funeral Procession Law
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Alexander [D] | Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. Kenneth Brandon [D] |
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. George Graham [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Filed |