NC H656 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forfeiture for Speeding to Elude Revisions
Title
Forfeiture for Speeding to Elude Revisions
Sponsors
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Kenneth Goodman [D] | Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] |
Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Rep. Earl Jones [D] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Ch. SL 2013-243 | |
2013-07-03 | Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013 | |
2013-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2013 | |
2013-06-25 | Ratified | |
2013-06-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-24 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-06-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2013 |
2013-06-20 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-06-19 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-06-19 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/09/2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-11 | House | Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Filed |