NC H653 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Report/Car Accident Caused by Seizure or Coma
Title
Report/Car Accident Caused by Seizure or Coma
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] |
Rep. Beverly Earle [D] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/27/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |