NC H652 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Ch. SL 2015-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Right to Try Act for Terminally Ill Patients

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to Try Act for Terminally Ill Patients

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-02 Ch. SL 2015-137
2015-07-02 Signed by Gov. 7/2/2015
2015-06-25 Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2015
2015-06-24 Ratified
2015-06-23SenateOrdered Enrolled
2015-06-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2015-06-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2015-06-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2015
2015-06-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2015-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2015-06-01SenateRe-ref Com On Health Care
2015-06-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-04-22SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-04-22SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-04-22SenateRegular Message Received From House
2015-04-22HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2015-04-21HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-04-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-04-20HousePlaced On Cal For 04/21/2015
2015-04-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-04-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-04-20HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary IV
2015-04-20HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-04-14HouseRef To Com On Health
2015-04-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-04-13HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback