NC H642 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Justice Reinvestment Act
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - A3 Haire\Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 79 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - A2 Guice\Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - A1 Bordsen\Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - A3 Haire\Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 79 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - A2 Guice\Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - A1 Bordsen\Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-192 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-15 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub No. 2 | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-13 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2011-06-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-09 | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2011-06-09 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-06 | Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-02 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-06-02 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-02 | Amend Failed 3 | |
2011-06-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-01 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-01 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-05-31 | Placed On Cal For 6/1/2011 | |
2011-05-31 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-31 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2011-04-14 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2011-04-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-06 | Serial Referral to Finance Stricken, if fav to Appropriations | |
2011-04-06 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-06 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |