NC H641 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Status: Introduced on March 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Summary
Archer Lodge Incorporated.
Title
Archer Lodge Incorporated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-08-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-06 | Postponed To 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-18 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H641 |