NC H634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Private Alternative Teacher Preparation
Title
Private Alternative Teacher Preparation
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Elmore [R] | Rep. Amos Quick [D] |
Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] | Rep. Cecil Brockman [D] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Education - K-12 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |