NC H616 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
North Carolina Public Benefit Corporation Act
Title
North Carolina Public Benefit Corporation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A3 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A1 McGrady Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A3 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A1 McGrady Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/24/2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/23/2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Stricken |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |