NC H613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Essential Services For Homeless Youth
Title
Essential Services For Homeless Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Homelessness, Foster Care, and Dependency, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed |