NC H613 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Ch. SL 2009-20
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Ch. SL 2009-20
Summary
Federal Reservation Statute.
Title
Federal Reservation Statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Ch. SL 2009-20 | |
2009-04-30 | Signed By Gov. 4/30/2009 | |
2009-04-27 | Pres. To Gov. 4/24/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Ratified | |
2009-04-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-20 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-04-20 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Placed On Cal For 4/16/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-31 | Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-31 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-17 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S808 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H613 |