NC H596 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study/MPO Voting Power Distribution
Title
Study/MPO Voting Power Distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - A1 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - A1 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |