NC H592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Check-Off Clean Water Mgmnt Tr. Fund
Title
Check-Off Clean Water Mgmnt Tr. Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed |